THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:04:16 AM
Silverberg, Samuel
CPSO#:
25435
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Samuel Silverberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 7 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
111 Saint Regis Cres S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 03 Jun 2022
Instructions/Address:RSRS
111 St. Regis Cr S
North York, Ontario
M6J 1Y6
Tel: 416-398-0638
Fax: 416-398-5932
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
http://www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 03 Feb 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 25 Jan 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 03 May 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 17 Jun 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2022 |