THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:55:48 PM
Slezic, Ivo
CPSO#:
25389
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: University of Zagreb, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: I Slezic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Trillium Health Centre
6660 Kennedy, Mississauga ON L5T 2M9
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: April 1, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On June 6, 2013, Trillium Health Partners notified the College that Dr. Slezic privileges were restricted, efffective April 1, 2013.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:14 Mar 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2017 |