THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:51:16 PM
Nelles, Constance Ruth Macklem
CPSO#:
25346
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 May 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
11 St Regis Crescent S
North York ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 25 May 2021
Instructions/Address:RSRS
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 22 Nov 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 May 2021 |