THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/03/24 0:48:19 AM
Ballingall, David Low Kyle
CPSO#:
25314
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 25, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dr. David Low Kyle Ballingall to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 25, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Ballingall engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my walk-in practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Ballingall is limited to practicing as a general practitioner in the Oncology Clinic at London Health Sciences Centre Oncology Clinic and must practice no more than one (1) day per week.
Dr. Ballingall must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:
(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.
In addition, Dr. Ballingall will undergo a reassessment of his practice in approximately 6 months.