THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:00:02 AM
McDougall, Donald Campbell
CPSO#:
25296
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical records may send their request by e-mail to: [email protected].
Date Received: 21 Apr 2015
Instructions/Address:Please submit a written request to Dr. Donald McDougall
Suite 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa, ON K2A 3Z3
Date Received: 25 Sep 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 31, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Donald Campbell McDougall to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Department):
I, Dr. Donald Campbell McDougall:
1.Certificate of registration number 25296, am a member of the College. The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.
2. Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated November 21, 2012 (the “Notice of Hearing”).
3. Acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for an original copy of this Undertaking as executed by me, the College has agreed to withdraw the Notice of Hearing.
4. Hereby resign from the College effective May 31, 2013 (the “Effective Date”).
5. Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
6. Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing,
12. Give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
13. Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register.