THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:56:09 PM
Peoples, Brian
CPSO#:
25251
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Sep 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Peoples Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients may submit a request for their medical records to RSRS at 1-888-563-3732 or by visiting www.recordsolutions.ca/drpeoples
Date Received: 21 Sep 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2018 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Jun 1991
Summary:
In June 1991, Dr. Peoples pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Peoples guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Peoples be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register; that he be fined $3000.00; and that, should the Doctor fail to pay the fine and/or fail to present himself for the reprimand within sixty days of the Order becoming final, his licence to practice would be suspended until the terms were satisfied.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 13 Jun 1991
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian Peoples to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 4, 2018:
College investigations were conducted into Dr. Peoples’ general medicine practice. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Peoples resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)