THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:16:23 AM
Hodby, Elizabeth Delia
CPSO#:
25149
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Sep 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hodby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2022 |