THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:26:20 PM
Tam, Cherk Shing
CPSO#:
25112
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2004 |