THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:13:04 PM
Carroll, Derek William
CPSO#:
25063
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1974 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jan 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jun 1990 |