THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:26:02 PM
Sie, Kian Gwan
CPSO#:
25032
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Aug 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, Indonesian
Education: University of Airlangga, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kian G. Sie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:O'Connor Family Practice & Walk In
942 O'Connor Drive
Toronto ON M4B 2S7
Tele: 416 755 8281
Date Received: 18 Dec 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1973 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2020 |