THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:35:53 AM
Carswell, David James
CPSO#:
24958
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Nov 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Feb 2016 |