THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:20:26 AM
Fitzgerald, Gerald William Norman
CPSO#:
24933
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Oct 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Nov 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jun 2000 |