THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:12:48 AM
Psenicka, Paul
CPSO#:
24927
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
02 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jul 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
20-Apr-2011
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: University of Palacky, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1972 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry |
Effective: 19 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Dec 1981
Summary:
In December 1981, Dr. Psenicka pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Psenicka guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Psenicka be reprimanded and recommended that his name be published in the College Reports. The Committee further ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of thirty days, and that he be fined the sum of $2000.00, with the proviso that if he failed to pay this amount, his licence would be suspended for an additional thirty days.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 14 Dec 1981