THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:26:29 PM
Agulefo, Nwafor Theodoric Chukwulobe
CPSO#:
24919
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ibo
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1957 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1959 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Aug 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |