THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:00:55 PM
Ratnanather, Kingsley Vincent Jeyam
CPSO#:
24871
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jul 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Ceylon, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Dr. Ratnanather at 416-245-2538 or write to him to request medical record information.
Apartment 112
1750 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto, ON M6L 3C4
Date Received: 06 Mar 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Apr 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 24, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kingsley Vincent Ratnanather has resigned from the College.