THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 17:24:20 PM
Reynolds, Kenneth John
CPSO#:
24869
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, (416) 398-0638 or 1(888) 563-3732
Date Received: 06 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 1, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Kenneth John Reynolds to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 1, 2015:
Dr. Reynolds has ceased to practise medicine due to disability and therefore cannot see patients or provide any medical advice or services.