THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:26:28 AM
Rose, Donald Keith
CPSO#:
24799
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:11 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Dec 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2013 |