THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:53:58 PM
Barnes, Patrick Theophilus
CPSO#:
24786
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Mar 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 May 2012 |
Concerns
Source:
Executive Committee
Active Date: July 15, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Patrick Theophilus Barnes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):
I, Dr. Patrick Theophilus Barnes:
(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation by the College regarding whether I have practiced outside of the practice restrictions on my certificate of registration and, thereby, breached my Undertaking to the College, dated September 17, 2008 (the “Investigation”).
(3) Acknowledge that there was no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.
(4) Hereby resign from the College effective May 15, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).
(5)Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(6) Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I have applied for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the Investigation it terminated as a result of this Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(9) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the Effective Date.
(11) Acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(12) Consent to this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.