THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:46:42 PM
Hanson, Peter George
CPSO#:
24782
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter G. Hanson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1971 to 14 Jun 1972
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 27 Oct 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2015 |