THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:37:25 AM
Bartlett, Robert Paul
CPSO#:
24770
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Paul Bartlett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Tavistock Community Health Inc.
80 Maria Street
Tavistock, ON N0B 2R0
519-655-2322
Date Received: 06 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |