Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 1987
Summary:
In June 1987, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Green incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Green(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1989-06-20
Hearing Date(s): Sep 29, 1986
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 18 Dec 1992
Decision: Application Accepted
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 31 Oct 1990
Decision: Application Denied
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 11 Jul 1990
Decision: Application Denied
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 14 Dec 1989
Decision: Application Denied
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 1986
Summary:
In August 1986, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Green guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he charged a fee that was excessive in relation to the services performed, contrary to s. 27(9); and in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Green be fined the sum of $5000.00, this amount to be paid within thirty days of the Order becoming final; that Dr. Green(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of one year, the suspension to be served consecutive to any other suspension of licence outstanding; and that if the stipulated fine was not paid, then Dr. Green(s licence would be suspended for one additional year.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1987-10-14
Hearing Date(s): 07 Jan 1986
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Nov 1985
Summary:
In November 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Green guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Green be reprimanded, that the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Register, and that the Doctor attend to be reprimanded on a date to be set by the Registrar. The Committee further ruled that Dr. Green(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of six months, and that if he failed to attend the College as required for his reprimand, then the suspension of licence would continue for a further six months.
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 1987-01-13
Hearing Date(s): 20 Nov 1985