THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:07:23 AM
Kee, Barbara Elaine
CPSO#:
24728
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1450 O'Connor Drive, Bldg 1
Unit 20
Toronto ON M4B 2T8
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 477-2015
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Access Services Canada,
854 Upper Canada Drive,
Sarnia, ON N7W 1A 4
1 800 971 8038
Date Received: 30 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |