THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:00:39 AM
Bellack, Allan Gilbert
CPSO#:
24721
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jun 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2179 Elmira Dr
Ottawa, ON K2C 3S1
or
Phase IV, 6th floor 140 Promenade du Portage
Gatineau QC K1A 0J9
Date Received: 29 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1973 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |