THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:03:35 PM
Haynes, Robert Brian
CPSO#:
24697
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. R.B. Haynes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hamilton Health Sciences Health Records
Room 1D14
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Tel: 905 521 2100
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2016 |