THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:38:58 AM
Stogre, Rosemary Ann
CPSO#:
24657
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jun 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1971 to 14 Jun 1972
Other - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1972 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Apr 2014 |