THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:35:30 AM
Kain, Brian Forrester
CPSO#:
24651
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian Forrester Kain to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 15, 2016:
Clinical deficiencies in Dr. Kain’s practice have been identified. As a result, Dr. Kain has resigned from the College effective October 31, 2016 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.