THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:39:58 AM
Turner, Tyrone Silvio
CPSO#:
24637
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 1972
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Tyrone Turner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital |
Thunder Bay |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TYRONE SILVIO TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1972 |