THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:49:08 AM
Abrams, Howard Joel
CPSO#:
24636
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Abrams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Date Received: 28 May 2018
Instructions/Address:RSRS Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 1-888-398-5932
Date Received: 26 Oct 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |