THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:21:45 AM
Gatrall, James Rolf
CPSO#:
24606
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
12 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2002 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 12 Aug 2002 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 2002
Summary:
On August 12, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Gatrall’s plea of no contest and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient; he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; he prescribed, dispensed or sold drugs for improper purpose; he falsified a record relating to his practice; committed acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.
The Committee ordered the following:
THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE DIRECTS the Registrar to revoke Dr. Gatrall’s certificate of registration, such revocation to take effect immediately.
THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE REQUIRES Dr. Gatrall to attend before this panel to be reprimanded.
THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE REQUIRES Dr. Gatrall to pay part of the College’s costs to the College, fixed in the amount of $2,500.00 by August 30, 2002.
THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE REQUIRES Dr. Gatrall to pay to the College $10,000.00, to be held by the College in trust, to guarantee the payment of any amount the College may pay out in respect of the patient for funding for therapy and counselling pursuant to section 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 12, 2002