THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:17:03 AM
Abu-Zahra, Hakam Tawfic
CPSO#:
24532
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 May 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records location as per above.
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Rd
Windsor, ON N8W 2X3
Tel: (519) 253-5253
Date Received: 11 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:14 Mar 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |