THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:34:06 PM
Miller, Hensley Arthur Basil
CPSO#:
24508
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
12 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 May 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of West Indies, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking for a copy of their records should send a written request to:
Academic Clinicians Management Services/Health Data Resources
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto, ON
M4N 3M5
Date Received: 15 Sep 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2009 |