THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:18:26 AM
Hindmarsh, Carol
CPSO#:
24478
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Mar 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
14-Apr-2005
Former Names:
Hindmarsh-Clark, Carol (used until: 20 Sep 1987 )
Clark, Carol Hindmarsh (used until: 18 Jun 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2000 |