THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:09:35 PM
Doerksen, David Cornelius
CPSO#:
24467
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Mar 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Manitoba, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David C. Doerksen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Ave.
Windsor, ON N8W 1L9
Date Received: 22 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |