THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:54:51 PM
Slaughter, David Norman
CPSO#:
24445
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Apr 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
North York General Hospital,4001 Leslie Street, Toronto, ON M2K 1E1 and Credit Valley Hospital, 2200 Eglinton Avenue West, Mississauga, ON L5M 2N1
Date Received: 29 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Mar 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:06 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Apr 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |