THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:50:34 AM
Boszko, Andres
CPSO#:
24360
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish, Ukrainian
Education: University of Madrid, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber river hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON M3M0B2
Phone: 416 2421000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:08 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDRES BOSZKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSZKO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jan 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 1976 |