THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:21:03 AM
Elkin, Eric Neil
CPSO#:
24287
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Nov 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Elkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Non-Office Records:
Royal Ottawa Place LTC
1141 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON K1Z 7K4
Amica Retirement Residence Westboro
491 Richmond Road
Ottawa, ON K2A 1G4
Or
Carling Retirement Community
200 Lockhart Avenue
Ottawa, ON K2A 4C6
Date Received: 11 May 2020
Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact:
Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
1-800-775-0093
www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 09 Jan 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |