THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:56:56 AM
Mathieu, Jackson Edouard
CPSO#:
24187
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
03 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Sep 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Sep 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Apr 2013 |