THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:45:42 PM
Cook, Katherine Anne
CPSO#:
24177
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
22 May 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Sep 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
22-May-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage & Retrieval Services at: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 07 Jul 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1971 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 22 May 2020 |