THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:03:40 AM
Gibson, Glenn Craig
CPSO#:
24121
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Glenn C. Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Glenn Craig Gibson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 16, 2016:
Dr. Gibson was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice and is incompetent. After the investigation, Dr. Gibson resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)