THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:19:40 AM
Alfred, Alexander Arvo Augustin
CPSO#:
24002
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
25 Jan 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1970 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 25 Jan 1995 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 1994
Summary:
In July 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Alfred guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, as amended, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a professional respect or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner or of incompetence. The Committee further found Dr. Alfred guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 26(28) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, and s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Alfred be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 1997-05-26
Hearing Date(s): Feb 03, 1994