THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:39:24 PM
O'Brien, Elizabeth Philomena
CPSO#:
23996
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Aug 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
25-Oct-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Etobicoke Psychiatric Consultants, Unit 103, 127 Westmore Drive, Toronto, ON M9V 3Y6
Date Received: 29 Jun 2015
Instructions/Address:Attention: Margie
Unit 103
127 Westmore Drive
Toronto, ON M9V 3Y6
Date Received: 08 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |