THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:14:11 PM
Butchey, Maurice Rienzi Satyamurthi
CPSO#:
23968
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Butchey and Dr. Janki Butchey Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:68 Birchmont Walk
London, ON N6K 4K5
Date Received: 20 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 6, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Maurice Rienzi Satyamurthi Butchey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 6, 2020:
Dr. Butchey previously entered into an undertaking with the College pursuant to which he agreed to undergo remediation and submit to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine. After the reassessment, Dr. Butchey resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of April 11, 2018, Dr. Butchey has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)