THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:46:43 PM
Wexler, Howard Ronald
CPSO#:
23949
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jan 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre - St Josephs Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London, ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jan 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |