THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:31:45 PM
O'Connor, Denis Peter Claver
CPSO#:
23945
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 May 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gaelic
Education: National University of Ireland, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Sep 1971 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 May 2005 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Jul 1997
Summary:
In July 1997, the Discipline Committee found Dr. O(Connor guilty of professional misconduct as defined in Ontario Regulations 448/80, and Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27.21 and 29.22; and that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting a member(s patients, contrary to s. 27.3 and 29.3, respectively.
The Committee considered the joint submission of counsel and ordered the following penalty:
1) That Dr. O(Connor be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recordedin the Register;
2) That Dr. O(Connor complete the College(s Medical record-keeping course for physicians in March 1998 and provide satisfactory evidence to the Registrar of having done so. In the event that satisfactory proof is not provided to the Registrar by March 30, 1998, the Committee orders that Dr. O(Connor(s certificate of registration be suspended until such time as Dr. O(Connor completes the course and provides satisfactory evidence to the Registrar that he has done so; and
3) That Dr. O(Connor complete the CPSO(s Physician-Patient Communication and Interviewing Skills Course by June 30, 1999 and furnish satisfactory proof thereof to the Registrar. In the event that such proof is not provided to the Registrar by June 30, 1999, the Committee orders that Dr. O(Connor(s certificate of registration be suspended until such time as Dr. O(Connor completes the course and provides satisfactory evidence to the Registrar that he has done so.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 05, 1998