THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:43:18 AM
Wadhwa, Atma Singh
CPSO#:
23939
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Punjab University India, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2015 |