THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:25:35 PM
Shah, Zafar Ali
CPSO#:
23917
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
339 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
London ON N6A 5A5
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Mar 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZAFAR ALI SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Sep 1970 to 30 Jun 1971
Resident 1 - Cardiothoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 May 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2023 |