THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:16:50 PM
Leibl, Raymond Danny
CPSO#:
23915
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
21 Sep 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1971 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2001 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 21 Sep 2001 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Jun 2001
Summary:
On June 22, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Leibl guilty of professional misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in regard to the therapy he provided to patients, improperly used his authority to prescribe or dispense a drug and prescribed and dispensed drugs to a patient for an improper purpose. Dr. Leibl was also found guilty of professional misconduct with respect to engaging in sexual impropriety with a patient and verbally and physically abusing a patient. Dr. Leibl failed to maintain the patient records a physician is required to maintain and falsified a record regarding an examination or treatment of a patient; all of this to be considered a display of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct unbecoming a physican. Dr.Leibl was found to be incompetent.
Having heard a motion for adjournment of the penalty hearing, the Discipline Committee ordered as a condition of his certificate of registration, that Dr. Leibl(s certificate of registration be suspended effective Tuesday, July 24, 2001, at 12:01 a.m. until the disposition of the penalty hearing is disposed of.
On September 20, 2001, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Leibl be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Register and that his certificate of registration be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-09-17
Hearing Date(s): Dec 11, 2000