THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:39:18 AM
Ponnampalam, Mathew Chelvasingam
CPSO#:
23890
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Scottish Conjoint Board(Scottish triple), 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2006 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Sep 1993
Summary:
In a decision released in September 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ponnampalam guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. Dr. Ponnampalam was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2. Dr. Ponnampalam was to be fined the sum of $5000.00.
3. Failure to comply with items 1 and 2 of the penalty within sixty days of this Order becoming final would result in the suspension of Dr. Ponnampalam(s licence to practice for a period of three months.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1994-04-05
Hearing Date(s): 03 May 1993