THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:05:54 PM
de Souza, Fructuoso Martinho Jose Antonio
CPSO#:
23875
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: F.M. de Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Limited
Head Office
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093
www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 30 Jun 2014
Instructions/Address:Records Management
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933 2904
E-mail: [email protected]
Date Received: 23 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2015 |