THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:50:22 PM
Leung, Robert Sai-Lun
CPSO#:
23785
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. R.S.L. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Leung's medical records are being stored by:
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Website: http://www.rsrs.com
Tel: 416-398-0638
Fax: 416-398-5932
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 09 Nov 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jun 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |